República de Guatemala
Republic of Guatemala Gabinete
Cabinet
Ultima actualización / Last update: January 18, 2012
Presidente / President | |||
Alvaro Colóm | 14 Jan 2008 | 14 Jan 2012 |
Vicepresidente / Vicepresident | |||
Rafael Espada | 14 Jan 2008 | 14 Jan 2012 |
Ministerio de Agricultura y Alimentación / Ministry of Agriculture and Food Policy | |||
Juan Alfonzo de León | 26 Feb 2010 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Mario Aldana Pérez | 17 Mar 2009 | 26 Feb 2010 | |
Julio Recinos | 16 Jul 2008 | 17 Mar 2009 | |
Raul Robles | 14 Jan 2008 | 16 Jul 2008 |
Ministerio de Ambiente y Recursos Naturales / Ministry of Environment and Natural Resources | |||
Luis Armando Zurita Tablada | 30 Jul 2011 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Luis Ferraté Feliche | 14 Jan 2008 | 30 Jul 2011 |
Ministerio de Comunicaciones, Infraestructura y Vivienda / Ministry of Communications, Infrastructure and Housing | |||
Jesús Insua Ramazzini | 05 Jan 2011 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Guillermo Andrés Castillo | 03 Sept 2010 | 05 Jan 2011 | |
Luis Alfredo Alejos Olivero | 14 Jan 2008 | 03 Sept 2010 |
Ministerio de Cultura y Deportes / Ministry of Culture and Sports | |||
Héctor Leonel Escobedo Ayala | 02 Sept 2010 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Jerónimo Lancerio Chingo | 14 Jan 2008 | 02 Sept 2010 |
Ministerio de la Defensa Nacional / Ministry of National Defense | |||
Juan José Ruiz Morales | 5 May 2011 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Abraham Valenzuela | 22 Dec 2008 | 5 May 2011 | |
Marco Tulio García Franco | 14 Jan 2008 | 22 Dec 2008 |
Ministerio de Economía / Ministry of Economy | |||
Luis Velasquez Quiroa | 11 May 2011 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Erick Haroldo Coyoy Echeverría | 23 Jun 2009 | 11 May 2011 | |
Rubén Morales Monroy | 17 Mar 2009 | 23 Jun 2009 | |
Rómulo Caballeros | 30 Apr 2008 | 16 Mar 2009 | |
José Carlos García Macal | 14 Jan 2008 | 30 Apr 2008 |
Ministerio de Educación/ Ministry of Education | |||
Dennis Alonzo Mazariegos | 09 Mar 2010 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Bienvenido Argeta | 08 Sept 2009 | 09 Mar 2010 | |
Ana Ordoñez de Molina | 14 Jan 2008 | 03 Sept 2009 |
Ministerio de Energía y Minas / Ministry of Energy and Mines | |||
Alfredo Pokus | 21 Feb 2011 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Juan José Narciso Chuá | 7 Jan 2010 | 21 Feb 2011 | |
Carlos Meany | 14 Jan 2008 | 7 Jan 2010 |
Ministerio de Finanzas Públicas / Ministry of Public Finances | |||
Rolando del Cid | 15 Nov 2010 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Edgar Balsells | 24 Jun 2010 | 13 Nov 2010 | |
Juan Alberto Fuentes | 14 Jan 2008 | 24 jun 2010 |
Ministerio de Gobernación / Minister of the Interior | |||
Carlos Menocal | 28 Feb 2010 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Raúl Velasquez | 09 Jul 2009 | 28 Feb 2010 | |
Francisco Jiménez | 29 Jun 2008 | 09 Jul 2009 | |
Vinicio Gomez | 14 Jan 2008 | 28 Jun 2008 (died) |
Ministerio de Relaciones Exteriores / Ministry of Foreign Affairs | |||
Roger Haroldo Rodas Melgar | 14 Jan 2008 | 14 Jan 2012 |
Ministerio de Salud Pública y Asistencia Social / Ministry of Public Health and Social Services | |||
Ludwig Werner Ovalle Cabrera | 30 Oct 2009 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Celso Cerezo | 16 Jul 2008 | 30 Oct 2009 | |
Eusebio del Cid | 14 Jan 2008 | 16 Jul 2008 |
Ministerio de Trabajo y Previsión Social / Ministry of Labor and Social Welfare | |||
Mario Roberto Illescas | 26 Oct 2010 | 14 Jan 2012 | |
Edgar Alfredo Rodriguez | 14 Jan 2008 | 20 Oct 2010 |
Fuente / Source: Gobierno de la República de Guatemala